THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 08:51:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etherington Hall Queens University
3032
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-3134
Fax: (613) 533-3292

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site Moosonee
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site
LOCATION: Moosonee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine A. White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. White (CPSO#: 73580 )
Business Address: 3048 - 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 533-3134 Extn: 78381

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etherington Hall Queens University
3032
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-3134
Fax: (613) 533-3292

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site Moosonee
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site
LOCATION: Moosonee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine A. White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. White (CPSO#: 73580 )
Business Address: 3048 - 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 533-3134 Extn: 78381

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ANNE WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ANNE WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999