THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:53:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Alexandria Marine & General Hospita
120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 524-8323
Fax: (519) 524-8522

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jan 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 10 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Radan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Radan (CPSO#: 73584 )
Business Address: 120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
(519) 524-8689

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Alexandria Marine & General Hospita
120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 524-8323
Fax: (519) 524-8522

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jan 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 10 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Radan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Radan (CPSO#: 73584 )
Business Address: 120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
(519) 524-8689

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEKSANDAR RADAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEKSANDAR RADAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 May 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999