THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:08:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3155 Harvester Road Unit 203
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-637-8833
Fax: 905-637-6745

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jones (CPSO#: 73586 )
Business Address: Cama Woodlands
159 Panin Road
Burlington Ontario L7P 5A6
(905) 681-6441
Business Address: Carpenter Hospice
2250 Parkway Drive
Burlington Ontario L7P 1T1
(905) 631-9994
Business Address: Alexander Place
329 Parkside Drive
Waterdown Ontario L0R 2H0
(905) 689-2662
Business Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
(905) 632-3737
Business Address: 3155 Harvester Road Unit 203
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
9056378833
Business Address: 203-3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
905-637-8833

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3155 Harvester Road Unit 203
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-637-8833
Fax: 905-637-6745

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jones (CPSO#: 73586 )
Business Address: Cama Woodlands
159 Panin Road
Burlington Ontario L7P 5A6
(905) 681-6441
Business Address: Carpenter Hospice
2250 Parkway Drive
Burlington Ontario L7P 1T1
(905) 631-9994
Business Address: Alexander Place
329 Parkside Drive
Waterdown Ontario L0R 2H0
(905) 689-2662
Business Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
(905) 632-3737
Business Address: 3155 Harvester Road Unit 203
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
9056378833
Business Address: 203-3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
905-637-8833

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA MARY JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA MARY JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999