THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:10:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1979
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kennedy Medical Clinic
Unit 6
510 Drift Current Drive
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 4B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 568-1173
Fax: (905) 568-2621

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: OZ.WAHBA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Wahba (CPSO#: 73587 )
Business Address: 6-510 Driftcurrent Dr
Mississauga ON L4Z 4B4
905 568 1173

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kennedy Medical Clinic
Unit 6
510 Drift Current Drive
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 4B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 568-1173
Fax: (905) 568-2621

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: OZ.WAHBA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Wahba (CPSO#: 73587 )
Business Address: 6-510 Driftcurrent Dr
Mississauga ON L4Z 4B4
905 568 1173

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ODETTE ZAKARIA WAHBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAHBA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ODETTE ZAKARIA WAHBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAHBA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999