THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:00:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 307
164 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6V 1B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 595-0559
Fax: (905) 595-0579

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sanam Shorey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shorey (CPSO#: 73597 )
Business Address: 307 - 164 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6V 1B4
(905) 595-0559

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 307
164 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6V 1B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 595-0559
Fax: (905) 595-0579

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sanam Shorey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shorey (CPSO#: 73597 )
Business Address: 307 - 164 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6V 1B4
(905) 595-0559

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANAM SAM SHOREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOREY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANAM SAM SHOREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOREY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999