THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:02:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
1079 Maple Avenue
Milton Ontario L9T 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 876-1011
Fax: (905) 876-3401

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mike R. Gilbert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gilbert (CPSO#: 73600 )
Business Address: Suite 2
1079 Maple Avenue
Milton Ontario L9T 0A5
(905) 876-1011
Business Address: 725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
(905) 878-2383

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
1079 Maple Avenue
Milton Ontario L9T 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 876-1011
Fax: (905) 876-3401

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mike R. Gilbert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gilbert (CPSO#: 73600 )
Business Address: Suite 2
1079 Maple Avenue
Milton Ontario L9T 0A5
(905) 876-1011
Business Address: 725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
(905) 878-2383

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL RORY GILBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILBERT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL RORY GILBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILBERT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999