THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:56:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 645-4404
Fax: (705) 646-2211

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sansom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sansom (CPSO#: 73604 )
Business Address: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
(705) 645-4404

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 645-4404
Fax: (705) 646-2211

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sansom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sansom (CPSO#: 73604 )
Business Address: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
(705) 645-4404

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT MICHAEL SANSOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANSOM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT MICHAEL SANSOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANSOM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999