THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:20:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hosptial
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-632-3737
Extension: 4812
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Preyra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Preyra (CPSO#: 73607 )
Business Address: 3125 Saddleworth Cres
Oakville ON L6M 0A8
416-579-2231
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2

Corporation Name: Ian Preyra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Corporation Name: Preyra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jan 2008

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hosptial
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-632-3737
Extension: 4812
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Preyra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Preyra (CPSO#: 73607 )
Business Address: 3125 Saddleworth Cres
Oakville ON L6M 0A8
416-579-2231
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2

Corporation Name: Ian Preyra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Corporation Name: Preyra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jan 2008

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN JAMES ROBERT PREYRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREYRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN JAMES ROBERT PREYRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREYRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999