THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:58:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057213546
Fax: 9057214342
Address: Lakeridge Health Corporation
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 3200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Whitby Site Whitby
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Whitby Site
LOCATION: Whitby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Barrese Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Barrese (CPSO#: 73612 )
Business Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Health Centre
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
905 721 3546

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057213546
Fax: 9057214342
Address: Lakeridge Health Corporation
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 3200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Whitby Site Whitby
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Whitby Site
LOCATION: Whitby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Barrese Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Barrese (CPSO#: 73612 )
Business Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Health Centre
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
905 721 3546

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NANCY BARRESE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRESE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NANCY BARRESE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRESE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999