THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:26:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Malinowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Malinowski (CPSO#: 73613 )
Business Address: St. Francis Memorial Hospital
300 - 21 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
(613) 756-9888

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Malinowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Malinowski (CPSO#: 73613 )
Business Address: St. Francis Memorial Hospital
300 - 21 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
(613) 756-9888

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON ROBERT JOSEPH MALINOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALINOWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON ROBERT JOSEPH MALINOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALINOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999