THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:10:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Box 211
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 79679
Fax: (613) 739-6993

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kayvan Amjadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Amjadi (CPSO#: 73618 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Box 211
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 79679
Fax: (613) 739-6993

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kayvan Amjadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Amjadi (CPSO#: 73618 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAYVAN AMJADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMJADI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAYVAN AMJADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMJADI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 03 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Oct 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999