THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:13:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 837-6440
Extension: 2333
Fax: (519) 837-6426
Address: Hospice Wellington
795 Scottsdale Drive
Guelph Ontario N1G 3R8
Phone: (519) 822-6660
Fax: (519) 822-2660

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Robinson (CPSO#: 73632 )
Business Address: 795 Scottsdale Drive
Guelph Ontario N1G 3R8
(519) 822-6660
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 837-6440
Extension: 2333
Fax: (519) 837-6426
Address: Hospice Wellington
795 Scottsdale Drive
Guelph Ontario N1G 3R8
Phone: (519) 822-6660
Fax: (519) 822-2660

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Robinson (CPSO#: 73632 )
Business Address: 795 Scottsdale Drive
Guelph Ontario N1G 3R8
(519) 822-6660
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH LYNN ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH LYNN ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999