THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:10:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SLOVAK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Extension: 3924
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 146 Oliver Road
Campbellford
Campbellford Ontario K0V 1L0
Phone: (707) 653-1140
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Extension: 6198
Fax: (705) 328-2817

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Voros Greiner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Voros (CPSO#: 73634 ) Dr. K. Greiner (CPSO#: 72190 )
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: Campbellford Memorial
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
(705) 643-1140
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 328-6196

Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SLOVAK
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Extension: 3924
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 146 Oliver Road
Campbellford
Campbellford Ontario K0V 1L0
Phone: (707) 653-1140
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Extension: 6198
Fax: (705) 328-2817

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Voros Greiner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Voros (CPSO#: 73634 ) Dr. K. Greiner (CPSO#: 72190 )
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: Campbellford Memorial
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
(705) 643-1140
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 328-6196

Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIO VOROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOROS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIO VOROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOROS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999