THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:51:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Lanark County CNC
207 Robertson Road
Lanark Ontario K0G 1K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 259-2182
Fax: (613) 259-5235
Address: Perth and Smith Falls
District Hospital
GWM Site
33 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
Phone: (613) 8123495
Fax: (613) 259-2182

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.R. Wahay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wahay (CPSO#: 73636 )
Business Address: Perth and Smith Falls
District Hospital
GWM Site
33 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
(613) 267-1500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Lanark County CNC
207 Robertson Road
Lanark Ontario K0G 1K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 259-2182
Fax: (613) 259-5235
Address: Perth and Smith Falls
District Hospital
GWM Site
33 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
Phone: (613) 8123495
Fax: (613) 259-2182

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.R. Wahay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wahay (CPSO#: 73636 )
Business Address: Perth and Smith Falls
District Hospital
GWM Site
33 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
(613) 267-1500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEIGH ROSE WAHAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAHAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEIGH ROSE WAHAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAHAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999