THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:38:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
North Shore Health Network Blind River
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deljit Dhanoa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dhanoa (CPSO#: 73655 )
Business Address: 1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
North Shore Health Network Blind River
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deljit Dhanoa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dhanoa (CPSO#: 73655 )
Business Address: 1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DELJIT SINGH DHANOA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHANOA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DELJIT SINGH DHANOA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHANOA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999