THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:46:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bloor West Village Womens Clinic
Suite 403
2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 849-4595
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1678 BLOOR ST WEST
SUITE 301
Toronto Ontario M6P 1A9
Phone: 416-975-0315
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Culbert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Culbert (CPSO#: 73665 )
Business Address: Bloor West Village Women's Clinic
Suite 403
2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
(416) 849-4595
Business Address: 1678 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6P 1A9
(416) 975-9300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bloor West Village Womens Clinic
Suite 403
2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 849-4595
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1678 BLOOR ST WEST
SUITE 301
Toronto Ontario M6P 1A9
Phone: 416-975-0315
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Culbert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Culbert (CPSO#: 73665 )
Business Address: Bloor West Village Women's Clinic
Suite 403
2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
(416) 849-4595
Business Address: 1678 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6P 1A9
(416) 975-9300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER TAWNYA CULBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CULBERT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER TAWNYA CULBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CULBERT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999