THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:29:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1541 Jane St
North York ON M9N 2R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-645-7575
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 900 Albion Rd
Toronto Ontario M9V1A5
Phone: 647-722-2370
Fax: 416-367-4301
Address: 1651 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M6M 3W2
Phone: 416-653-5400
Fax: 416-657-3622

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.S. Grewal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Grewal (CPSO#: 73670 )
Business Address: 1995A Weston Road
Toronto Ontario M9N 1X2
(416) 242-2216
Business Address: 2549 Weston Road
Toronto Ontario M9N 2A7
(416) 240-8282
Business Address: 900 Albion Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1A5
(647) 722-2370
Business Address: 12 Flemington Rd
North York ON M6A 2N4
416 787 1661

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1541 Jane St
North York ON M9N 2R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-645-7575
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 900 Albion Rd
Toronto Ontario M9V1A5
Phone: 647-722-2370
Fax: 416-367-4301
Address: 1651 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M6M 3W2
Phone: 416-653-5400
Fax: 416-657-3622

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.S. Grewal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Grewal (CPSO#: 73670 )
Business Address: 1995A Weston Road
Toronto Ontario M9N 1X2
(416) 242-2216
Business Address: 2549 Weston Road
Toronto Ontario M9N 2A7
(416) 240-8282
Business Address: 900 Albion Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1A5
(647) 722-2370
Business Address: 12 Flemington Rd
North York ON M6A 2N4
416 787 1661

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASPREET SINGH GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASPREET SINGH GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999