THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 23:10:59 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of ICU
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Extension: 4534
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Critical Care Unit
Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6366
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Department of ICU
Windsor Regional Hospital
Oullette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4407
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maryland
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michel Haddad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Haddad (CPSO#: 73689 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6366
Business Address: Bluewater Health
Department of ICU
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400 Extn: 4534
Business Address: Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
Department of ICU
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4407

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of ICU
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Extension: 4534
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Critical Care Unit
Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6366
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Department of ICU
Windsor Regional Hospital
Oullette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4407
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maryland
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michel Haddad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Haddad (CPSO#: 73689 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6366
Business Address: Bluewater Health
Department of ICU
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400 Extn: 4534
Business Address: Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
Department of ICU
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4407

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHEL HADDAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADDAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHEL HADDAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADDAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999