THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:18:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville
Urgent Care Centre
110 Copper Creek Drive, unit 100
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-8911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 641 Cambrai Rd
CF Health Services Centre
Borden ON L0M 1C0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 385 Rexdale Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 1R9
Phone: 4164018510
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neetan Alikhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Alikhan (CPSO#: 73705 )
Business Address: Unit 100
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
(905) 472-8911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville
Urgent Care Centre
110 Copper Creek Drive, unit 100
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-8911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 641 Cambrai Rd
CF Health Services Centre
Borden ON L0M 1C0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 385 Rexdale Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 1R9
Phone: 4164018510
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neetan Alikhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Alikhan (CPSO#: 73705 )
Business Address: Unit 100
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
(905) 472-8911

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEETAN ALIKHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIKHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEETAN ALIKHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIKHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999