THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:49:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Punjab University India, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1433 Ontario Street
Business
Pediatrics Dept.
Burlington Ontario L7S 1G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 337 2716
Fax: 2893378396
Address: Department of Paediatrics
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
North Shore Road
Burlington Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arinder Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Malik (CPSO#: 73716 )
Business Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
(905) 632-3730
Business Address: 100A - 3305 Harvester Road
Unit 12
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
(289) 337-2716
Business Address: 1433 Ontario Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1G5
2893372716

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Punjab University India, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1433 Ontario Street
Business
Pediatrics Dept.
Burlington Ontario L7S 1G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 337 2716
Fax: 2893378396
Address: Department of Paediatrics
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
North Shore Road
Burlington Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arinder Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Malik (CPSO#: 73716 )
Business Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
(905) 632-3730
Business Address: 100A - 3305 Harvester Road
Unit 12
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
(289) 337-2716
Business Address: 1433 Ontario Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1G5
2893372716

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARINDER KAUR MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARINDER KAUR MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Punjab University India, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999