THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:04:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Pace Cardiology
581 Davis Dr
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Phone: 905-905-7917
Fax: (905) 953-0046

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Tsang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Tsang (CPSO#: 73729 )
Business Address: 581 Davis Drive
Suite 602
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Address: Southlake Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Pace Cardiology
581 Davis Dr
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Phone: 905-905-7917
Fax: (905) 953-0046

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Tsang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Tsang (CPSO#: 73729 )
Business Address: 581 Davis Drive
Suite 602
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Address: Southlake Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNICE TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNICE TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999