THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 06:06:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Fax: (705) 328-2817

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chandra Katakkar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Katakkar (CPSO#: 73744 ) Dr. M. Chandra (CPSO#: 74901 )
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Fax: (705) 328-2817

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chandra Katakkar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Katakkar (CPSO#: 73744 ) Dr. M. Chandra (CPSO#: 74901 )
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JYOTI MOIRA KATAKKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATAKKAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JYOTI MOIRA KATAKKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATAKKAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999