THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:18:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18 King Street East
Suite 1400
Toronto Ontario M5C 1C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-453-7150
Fax: 647-499-8191

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Apr 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brar (CPSO#: 73745 )
Business Address: 1400-18 King St E
Toronto ON M5C 1C4
(647) 247-4040

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18 King Street East
Suite 1400
Toronto Ontario M5C 1C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-453-7150
Fax: 647-499-8191

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Apr 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brar (CPSO#: 73745 )
Business Address: 1400-18 King St E
Toronto ON M5C 1C4
(647) 247-4040

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMURAN KAUR BRAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMURAN KAUR BRAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Apr 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 May 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999