THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:20:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Vascular Surgery
Room H185
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6947
Fax: (416) 855-2135
Address: East Toronto Vascular Clinic
1805 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M4L 3Y3
Phone: 416-691-2030
Fax: 416-259-7975

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 05 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew D. Dueck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dueck (CPSO#: 73751 )
Business Address: 1805 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M4L 3Y3
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite H185
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6947

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Vascular Surgery
Room H185
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6947
Fax: (416) 855-2135
Address: East Toronto Vascular Clinic
1805 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M4L 3Y3
Phone: 416-691-2030
Fax: 416-259-7975

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 05 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew D. Dueck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dueck (CPSO#: 73751 )
Business Address: 1805 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M4L 3Y3
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite H185
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6947

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW DAVID DUECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUECK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW DAVID DUECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUECK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999