THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:04:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Access Medical Centre
201-3029 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K2B 8E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 596-9840
Fax: (613) 596-0496
Address: Med-Team Clinic
99 Kakulu Rd
Kanata Ontario K2L 3C8
Phone: 613-592-1448
Fax: 613-591-3778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abiscott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Abiscott (CPSO#: 73757 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Access Medical Centre
201-3029 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K2B 8E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 596-9840
Fax: (613) 596-0496
Address: Med-Team Clinic
99 Kakulu Rd
Kanata Ontario K2L 3C8
Phone: 613-592-1448
Fax: 613-591-3778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abiscott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Abiscott (CPSO#: 73757 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSHUA ARTHUR ABISCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABISCOTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSHUA ARTHUR ABISCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABISCOTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 May 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 May 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 26 May 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1999