THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:08:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Aroga Lifestyle Medicine
Kingston/Quinte Region
Kingston ON K7L 1B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-888-802-7642
Fax: 613-417-3614
Address: 265 Dundas St E
Belleville General Hospital
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Phone: 613-969-5511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Quinte Health Care Corporation
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Phone: 613-969-5511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201 County Court Blvd
Unit 404
Brampton ON L6W 4L2
Phone: 613-417-3614
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Oct 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria E. Theodorou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Theodorou (CPSO#: 73759 )
Business Address: Aroga Lifestyle Medicine
Kingston/Quinte Region
Kingston Ontario K7L1B4
1-888-802-7642
Business Address: Quinte Healthcare Corporation
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Aroga Lifestyle Medicine
Kingston/Quinte Region
Kingston ON K7L 1B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-888-802-7642
Fax: 613-417-3614
Address: 265 Dundas St E
Belleville General Hospital
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Phone: 613-969-5511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Quinte Health Care Corporation
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Phone: 613-969-5511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201 County Court Blvd
Unit 404
Brampton ON L6W 4L2
Phone: 613-417-3614
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Oct 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria E. Theodorou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Theodorou (CPSO#: 73759 )
Business Address: Aroga Lifestyle Medicine
Kingston/Quinte Region
Kingston Ontario K7L1B4
1-888-802-7642
Business Address: Quinte Healthcare Corporation
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA EUGENIA THEODOROU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THEODOROU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA EUGENIA THEODOROU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THEODOROU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999