THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:33:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Urology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-6090
Fax: (613) 545-1970
Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock St
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: 613-544-3310
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
Box 64
19 Hospital Dr
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
Phone: 705-658-4544
Fax: 705-658-4917
Address: Lennox and Addington County General
Hospital
8 Richmond Park Dr
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
Phone: 613-354-3301
Extension: 202
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 11 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.S. Steele Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Steele (CPSO#: 73771 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666
Business Address: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
19 Hospital Drive
Box 664
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
(705) 658-4544
Business Address: Lennox & Addington County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee Ontario K7R 2B5
(613) 354-3301 Extn: 202

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Urology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-6090
Fax: (613) 545-1970
Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock St
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: 613-544-3310
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
Box 64
19 Hospital Dr
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
Phone: 705-658-4544
Fax: 705-658-4917
Address: Lennox and Addington County General
Hospital
8 Richmond Park Dr
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
Phone: 613-354-3301
Extension: 202
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 11 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.S. Steele Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Steele (CPSO#: 73771 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666
Business Address: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
19 Hospital Drive
Box 664
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
(705) 658-4544
Business Address: Lennox & Addington County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee Ontario K7R 2B5
(613) 354-3301 Extn: 202

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN SCOTT STEELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEELE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN SCOTT STEELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEELE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999