THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:30:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2401 Yonge Street, #LL07
Toronto, Ontario, Canada
M4P 3H1
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 345-5590
Fax: (647) 345-5597
Address: 833 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E8
Phone: 4164676555
Fax: 4164676474
Address: 726 Bloor St West Suite 308
Toronto Ontario M6G 4A1
Phone: 647-352-6005
Fax: 647-352-6008

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Lekas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lekas (CPSO#: 73783 )
Business Address: 726 Bloor Street West
Suite 308
Toronto Ontario M6G 1L4
(647) 352-6005
Business Address: Lower Level 07
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
(647) 345-5590
Business Address: 833 Coxwell Ave
Toronto Ontario M4c 3E8
416-467-6555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2401 Yonge Street, #LL07
Toronto, Ontario, Canada
M4P 3H1
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 345-5590
Fax: (647) 345-5597
Address: 833 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E8
Phone: 4164676555
Fax: 4164676474
Address: 726 Bloor St West Suite 308
Toronto Ontario M6G 4A1
Phone: 647-352-6005
Fax: 647-352-6008

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Lekas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lekas (CPSO#: 73783 )
Business Address: 726 Bloor Street West
Suite 308
Toronto Ontario M6G 1L4
(647) 352-6005
Business Address: Lower Level 07
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
(647) 345-5590
Business Address: 833 Coxwell Ave
Toronto Ontario M4c 3E8
416-467-6555

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHRIS LEKAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEKAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHRIS LEKAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEKAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999