THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:07:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ontario Diagnostic Centres
71 King St
Suite 102
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 897-1144
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bau (CPSO#: 73792 )
Business Address: 8 Browside Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5P 2V1
(416) 482-8088
Business Address: University Health Network
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1 PMB 285
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 6558
Business Address: Ontario Diagnostic Centre
102-71 King Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A2
(905) 877-1144

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ontario Diagnostic Centres
71 King St
Suite 102
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 897-1144
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bau (CPSO#: 73792 )
Business Address: 8 Browside Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5P 2V1
(416) 482-8088
Business Address: University Health Network
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1 PMB 285
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 6558
Business Address: Ontario Diagnostic Centre
102-71 King Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A2
(905) 877-1144

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN LU-LON BAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN LU-LON BAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999