THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:51:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: Muroff, Allyson Michelle (Used Until: 17 Aug 1999)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 704
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York Ontario M3B 3S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 497-0880
Fax: (416) 497-2650

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Merbaum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Merbaum (CPSO#: 73793 )
Business Address: 704 - 240 Duncan Mill Road
North York Ontario M3B 3S6
(416) 497-0880

General Information

Former Name: Muroff, Allyson Michelle (Used Until: 17 Aug 1999)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 704
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York Ontario M3B 3S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 497-0880
Fax: (416) 497-2650

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Merbaum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Merbaum (CPSO#: 73793 )
Business Address: 704 - 240 Duncan Mill Road
North York Ontario M3B 3S6
(416) 497-0880

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLYSON MICHELLE MERBAUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERBAUM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLYSON MICHELLE MERBAUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERBAUM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999