THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:19:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 5
1780 Markham Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1B 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 291-2205
Fax: (416) 291-0149

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Costa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Costa (CPSO#: 73821 )
Business Address: Unit 5
1780 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 2W2
(416) 291-2205

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 5
1780 Markham Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1B 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 291-2205
Fax: (416) 291-0149

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Costa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Costa (CPSO#: 73821 )
Business Address: Unit 5
1780 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 2W2
(416) 291-2205

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STACY LARA COSTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STACY LARA COSTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999