THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:28:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18 Newberry street
Belleville Ontario K8N 3N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 966-4377
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter M. Hollett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hollett (CPSO#: 73826 )
Business Address: 613-966-4377 Extn: 2

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter M. Hollett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Jan 2025

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter M. Hollett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18 Newberry street
Belleville Ontario K8N 3N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 966-4377
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter M. Hollett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hollett (CPSO#: 73826 )
Business Address: 613-966-4377 Extn: 2

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter M. Hollett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Jan 2025

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter M. Hollett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER MALCOLM HOLLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER MALCOLM HOLLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999