THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:28:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Department Of Anaesthesia
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Nov 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katherine Blight Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Blight (CPSO#: 73835 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Department of Anaesthesia
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Department Of Anaesthesia
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Nov 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katherine Blight Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Blight (CPSO#: 73835 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Department of Anaesthesia
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE RENEE BLIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLIGHT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE RENEE BLIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLIGHT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999