THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:15:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-85 Basaltic Rd
Concord ON L4K 1G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8882627763
Fax: 8843209652
Address: Maple Online
325 Front St W, 4th floor
Toronto Ontario M5V 2Y1
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888)745-0435
Address: 201-240 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto Ontario M3B
Phone: 4168405991
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marni Allyson Brooks Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brooks (CPSO#: 73837 )
Business Address: Canabo Medical Clinics
Little Lake Health Centre
105-11 Lakeside Terr
Barrie ON L4M 0H9
(888) 282-7763

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-85 Basaltic Rd
Concord ON L4K 1G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8882627763
Fax: 8843209652
Address: Maple Online
325 Front St W, 4th floor
Toronto Ontario M5V 2Y1
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888)745-0435
Address: 201-240 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto Ontario M3B
Phone: 4168405991
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marni Allyson Brooks Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brooks (CPSO#: 73837 )
Business Address: Canabo Medical Clinics
Little Lake Health Centre
105-11 Lakeside Terr
Barrie ON L4M 0H9
(888) 282-7763

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARNI ALLYSON BROOKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOKS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARNI ALLYSON BROOKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOKS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999