THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:12:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Del Norte, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Radiology
HHSC General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 46521
Fax: (905) 527-5761

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 15 Dec 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ramiro Larrazabal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Larrazabal (CPSO#: 73875 )
Business Address: Department of Radiology
HHSC General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 46521

Corporation Name: Dr. Ramiro Larrazabal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Dec 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Del Norte, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Radiology
HHSC General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 46521
Fax: (905) 527-5761

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 15 Dec 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ramiro Larrazabal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Larrazabal (CPSO#: 73875 )
Business Address: Department of Radiology
HHSC General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 46521

Corporation Name: Dr. Ramiro Larrazabal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Dec 2014

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Dec 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 15 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RAMIRO ALFREDO LARRAZABAL may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RAMIRO ALFREDO LARRAZABAL may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Del Norte, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1999
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2005

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1999