THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:18:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 Midland Ave
Midland Gardens LTC
Scarborough ON M1N 4E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6472853949
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 333 Bay St
Suite 1500
Toronto ON M5H 2R2
Phone: 4163643008
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Cedarvale Terrace
429 Walmer Road
Toronto Ontario M5P 2X9
Phone: (416) 967-6949
Fax: (416) 928-1965
Address: Castleview Wychwood Towers
351 Christie Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 3C3
Phone: (416) 392-5700
Fax: (416) 928-1965
Address: 5935 Bathurst Street
Cheltenham Care Community
Toronto Ontario M2R 1Y8
Phone: 4162234050
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Jonathon Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Taylor (CPSO#: 73898 )
Business Address: 351 Christie Street
6th Floor
Toronto Ontario M6G 3C4
(416) 392-5766
Business Address: 5935 Bathurst Street
Cheltenham Care Community
Toronto Ontario M2R 1Y8
4162234050
Business Address: 130 Midland Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1N 4E6
4162642301
Business Address: 333 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 2R2
4163643008

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 Midland Ave
Midland Gardens LTC
Scarborough ON M1N 4E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6472853949
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 333 Bay St
Suite 1500
Toronto ON M5H 2R2
Phone: 4163643008
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Cedarvale Terrace
429 Walmer Road
Toronto Ontario M5P 2X9
Phone: (416) 967-6949
Fax: (416) 928-1965
Address: Castleview Wychwood Towers
351 Christie Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 3C3
Phone: (416) 392-5700
Fax: (416) 928-1965
Address: 5935 Bathurst Street
Cheltenham Care Community
Toronto Ontario M2R 1Y8
Phone: 4162234050
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Jonathon Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Taylor (CPSO#: 73898 )
Business Address: 351 Christie Street
6th Floor
Toronto Ontario M6G 3C4
(416) 392-5766
Business Address: 5935 Bathurst Street
Cheltenham Care Community
Toronto Ontario M2R 1Y8
4162234050
Business Address: 130 Midland Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1N 4E6
4162642301
Business Address: 333 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 2R2
4163643008

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JONATHON TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JONATHON TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999