THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 22:30:12 PM

General Information

Former Name: Singh, Rajnee Kumari (Used Until: 12 Dec 2000)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-231 Oak Park Blvd
Oakville ON L6H 7S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2898350217
Fax: 2898350217

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Jolly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jolly (CPSO#: 73905 )
Business Address: 301 - 231 Oak Park Boulevard
Oakville Ontario L6H 7S8
2898350217

Corporation Name: Sanjit S. Jolly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jolly (CPSO#: 73905 ) Dr. S. Jolly (CPSO#: 73940 )
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street
Room C3-11B
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 524-2712

General Information

Former Name: Singh, Rajnee Kumari (Used Until: 12 Dec 2000)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-231 Oak Park Blvd
Oakville ON L6H 7S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2898350217
Fax: 2898350217

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Jolly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jolly (CPSO#: 73905 )
Business Address: 301 - 231 Oak Park Boulevard
Oakville Ontario L6H 7S8
2898350217

Corporation Name: Sanjit S. Jolly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jolly (CPSO#: 73905 ) Dr. S. Jolly (CPSO#: 73940 )
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street
Room C3-11B
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 524-2712

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJNEE KUMARI JOLLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOLLY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJNEE KUMARI JOLLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOLLY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999