THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 15:16:04 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Heart Health Institute
Unit 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Address: 235 Salem Road
Second Floor
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0B1
Phone: 905-426-8333
Fax: 905-426-4447
Address: 2391 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1K 2M5
Phone: (416) 750-9000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 250 Marlee Ave
Toronto Ontario M6B 1N6
Phone: 416-783-0000
Fax: 416-783-0002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ram Vijayaraghavan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Weir (CPSO#: 75049 ) Dr. R. Vijayaraghavan (CPSO#: 73907 )
Business Address: 250 Marlee Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6B 1N6
(416) 783-0000
Business Address: Suite E6-9
235 Salem Road
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0B1
(905) 426-8333
Business Address: 2391 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1K 2M5
(416) 750-9000
Business Address: Rouge Valley Cardiology
412 - 1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
(416) 281-9499

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Heart Health Institute
Unit 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Address: 235 Salem Road
Second Floor
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0B1
Phone: 905-426-8333
Fax: 905-426-4447
Address: 2391 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1K 2M5
Phone: (416) 750-9000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 250 Marlee Ave
Toronto Ontario M6B 1N6
Phone: 416-783-0000
Fax: 416-783-0002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ram Vijayaraghavan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Weir (CPSO#: 75049 ) Dr. R. Vijayaraghavan (CPSO#: 73907 )
Business Address: 250 Marlee Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6B 1N6
(416) 783-0000
Business Address: Suite E6-9
235 Salem Road
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0B1
(905) 426-8333
Business Address: 2391 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1K 2M5
(416) 750-9000
Business Address: Rouge Valley Cardiology
412 - 1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
(416) 281-9499

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAM VIJAYARAGHAVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIJAYARAGHAVAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAM VIJAYARAGHAVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIJAYARAGHAVAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999