THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:21:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto East General Hospital
Suite 305 K Wing
650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 465-6008
Fax: (416) 465-3901
Address: 215-840 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 5T2
Phone: 1-888-248-7812
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 31 Dec 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Vlaovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Vlaovic (CPSO#: 73908 )
Business Address: Suite 305
650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5M5
(416) 465-6008

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN, SERBIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto East General Hospital
Suite 305 K Wing
650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 465-6008
Fax: (416) 465-3901
Address: 215-840 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 5T2
Phone: 1-888-248-7812
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 31 Dec 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Vlaovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Vlaovic (CPSO#: 73908 )
Business Address: Suite 305
650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5M5
(416) 465-6008

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER DAVID VLAOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VLAOVIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER DAVID VLAOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VLAOVIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999