THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:03:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Queen St W
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 31920
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - Russell Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - Russell Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LL Buckley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Buckley (CPSO#: 73912 )
Business Address: 1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H1
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 31920

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Queen St W
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 31920
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - Russell Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - Russell Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LL Buckley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Buckley (CPSO#: 73912 )
Business Address: 1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H1
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 31920

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LESLIE LYNN BUCKLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCKLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LESLIE LYNN BUCKLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCKLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999