THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:23:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
701 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2K 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 913-6130
Fax: (647) 435-6730

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Limai Zou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Zou (CPSO#: 73922 )
Business Address: Suite 201
701 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2K 2Z3
(416) 913-6130

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
701 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2K 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 913-6130
Fax: (647) 435-6730

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Limai Zou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Zou (CPSO#: 73922 )
Business Address: Suite 201
701 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2K 2Z3
(416) 913-6130

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIMAI ZOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZOU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIMAI ZOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZOU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999