THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:06:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1821 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 0H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 335-5959
Fax: (905) 335-4757

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Feb 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 21 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leevin Mah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mah (CPSO#: 73942 )
Business Address: 1821 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 0H6
(905) 335-5959

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1821 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 0H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 335-5959
Fax: (905) 335-4757

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Feb 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 21 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leevin Mah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mah (CPSO#: 73942 )
Business Address: 1821 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 0H6
(905) 335-5959

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEEVIN MAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEEVIN MAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999