THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:03:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health & Wellness Centre
Koffler Student Services Centre
700 Bay St, 12th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 978-8079
Fax: (416) 978-7341
Address: CAMH
Bell Gateway Building, 4th floor
100 Stokes St
Toronto, ONTARIO
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 33640
Fax: 416 979 6853

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Jul 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Levinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Levinson (CPSO#: 73946 )
Business Address: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Bell Gateway Building - 4th Floor
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 33640
Business Address: Health & Wellness
Koffler Student Services Centre
Main Floor-Room 126
214 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 33640

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health & Wellness Centre
Koffler Student Services Centre
700 Bay St, 12th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 978-8079
Fax: (416) 978-7341
Address: CAMH
Bell Gateway Building, 4th floor
100 Stokes St
Toronto, ONTARIO
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 33640
Fax: 416 979 6853

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Jul 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Levinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Levinson (CPSO#: 73946 )
Business Address: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Bell Gateway Building - 4th Floor
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 33640
Business Address: Health & Wellness
Koffler Student Services Centre
Main Floor-Room 126
214 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 33640

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA JOY LEVINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVINSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA JOY LEVINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVINSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999