THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:21:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6435
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3276 St Clair Ave East
Toronto Ontario M1L1W1
Phone: 416-285-3666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Mamen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mamen (CPSO#: 73947 )
Business Address: Emergency Room
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
(705) 789-2311
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
Emergency Room
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6435
Business Address: Providence Healthcare
3276 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1L 1W1
(416) 285-3666

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6435
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3276 St Clair Ave East
Toronto Ontario M1L1W1
Phone: 416-285-3666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Mamen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mamen (CPSO#: 73947 )
Business Address: Emergency Room
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
(705) 789-2311
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
Emergency Room
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6435
Business Address: Providence Healthcare
3276 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1L 1W1
(416) 285-3666

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE KIRSTEN MAMEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAMEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE KIRSTEN MAMEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAMEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999