THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:40:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36B Prince Arthur Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5R 1A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 961-0113
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS Record Solutions
www.rsrs.com
1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 02 Dec 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrea Lobo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lobo (CPSO#: 73952 )
Business Address: 36 Prince Arthur Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5R 1A9
416-961-0113

Corporation Name: Andrea Lobo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Mar 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36B Prince Arthur Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5R 1A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 961-0113
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS Record Solutions
www.rsrs.com
1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 02 Dec 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrea Lobo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lobo (CPSO#: 73952 )
Business Address: 36 Prince Arthur Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5R 1A9
416-961-0113

Corporation Name: Andrea Lobo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Mar 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA NATALIE LOBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOBO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA NATALIE LOBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOBO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999