THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:15:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room H185
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 83680
Fax: (416) 480-5815

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 03 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Papia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Papia (CPSO#: 73955 )
Business Address: Room H185
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 83680

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room H185
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 83680
Fax: (416) 480-5815

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 03 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Papia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Papia (CPSO#: 73955 )
Business Address: Room H185
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 83680

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIUSEPPE PAPIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIUSEPPE PAPIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999