THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:58:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 417, The Court
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 282-4242
Fax: (416) 282-3812

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joanne Ma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ma (CPSO#: 73969 )
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
Suite 417
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
(416) 282-4242

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 417, The Court
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 282-4242
Fax: (416) 282-3812

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joanne Ma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ma (CPSO#: 73969 )
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
Suite 417
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
(416) 282-4242

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNE LI CHANG MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNE LI CHANG MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On March 9, 2022, at the Ontario Court of Appeal, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Joanna Ma in respect of an incident that took place in April-July 2006.
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On March 9, 2022, at the Ontario Court of Appeal, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Joanna Ma in respect of an incident that took place in April-July 2006.
 

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999