THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:20:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 649 Sheppard Ave W
Get Well Clinic
North York ON M3H 2S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-508-5691
Fax: 416-398-2436

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Javed Alloo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Alloo (CPSO#: 73970 )
Business Address: Get Well Clinic
649 Sheppard Ave West
Toronto ON M3H 2S4
416-508-5691‬
Business Address: Nymark Plaza
4839 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K8
(416) 498-3600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 649 Sheppard Ave W
Get Well Clinic
North York ON M3H 2S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-508-5691
Fax: 416-398-2436

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Javed Alloo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Alloo (CPSO#: 73970 )
Business Address: Get Well Clinic
649 Sheppard Ave West
Toronto ON M3H 2S4
416-508-5691‬
Business Address: Nymark Plaza
4839 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K8
(416) 498-3600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAVED ABBAS ALLOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLOO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAVED ABBAS ALLOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLOO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999