THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Emergency Department
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 675-4700
Fax: (705) 675-4794
Address: Espenola General Hospital
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Prpic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Prpic (CPSO#: 73974 )
Business Address: 841 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1M8
Business Address: Sudbury Regional Hospital
Emergency Deparment
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100 Extn: 1688

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Emergency Department
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 675-4700
Fax: (705) 675-4794
Address: Espenola General Hospital
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Prpic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Prpic (CPSO#: 73974 )
Business Address: 841 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1M8
Business Address: Sudbury Regional Hospital
Emergency Deparment
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100 Extn: 1688

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON CLAUDE PRPIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRPIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON CLAUDE PRPIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRPIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999