THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:02:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 5B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 406-5666
Fax: (416) 406-6667

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MASTROGIACOMO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Mastrogiacomo (CPSO#: 73976 )
Business Address: 658 Danforth Avenue, Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M4J 5B9
(416) 466-4438

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 5B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 406-5666
Fax: (416) 406-6667

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MASTROGIACOMO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Mastrogiacomo (CPSO#: 73976 )
Business Address: 658 Danforth Avenue, Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M4J 5B9
(416) 466-4438

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANK MASTROGIACOMO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASTROGIACOMO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANK MASTROGIACOMO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASTROGIACOMO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999